Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/09/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/09/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/11/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/11/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/11/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/11/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/11/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/16/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/16/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/25/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/25/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/29/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/30/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/31/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/08/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2002