Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/16/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/05/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/05/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/05/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/05/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/05/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/05/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/11/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/11/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/11/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 12/11/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/11/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 01/23/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/29/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/07/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/14/2002