Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/05/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/05/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/11/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/11/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 12/11/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/11/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/07/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/05/2002