Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/04/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/09/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/09/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/09/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/12/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/17/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/17/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/17/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/30/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/30/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/30/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/30/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/30/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/06/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/06/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/06/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/08/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/08/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/08/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/13/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/14/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/14/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/28/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/30/2001