Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/05/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/01/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/01/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/01/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/01/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/01/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/01/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/01/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/01/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/01/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/06/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/06/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/06/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/06/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/06/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/06/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/06/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/06/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/06/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/08/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/08/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/08/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/08/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/08/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/08/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/13/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/13/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/13/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 11/13/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/13/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/13/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 11/13/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/14/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/16/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/28/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/30/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/30/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 12/04/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/04/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 12/04/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 12/04/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/05/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/05/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 12/05/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 12/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/05/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/05/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 12/05/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/05/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 12/05/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/05/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/05/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/05/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 12/05/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/05/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 12/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/05/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/05/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 12/05/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/06/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/06/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/06/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/06/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 12/06/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 12/06/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/06/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 12/06/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 12/06/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/11/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/11/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/11/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/11/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/12/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/12/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 12/12/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/12/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/12/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 12/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/13/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/13/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/13/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 12/13/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/13/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 12/13/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 12/17/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 12/17/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 12/18/2001