Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/11/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/11/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/11/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/11/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/11/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/12/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/12/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/12/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/12/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/17/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/17/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/17/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/17/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/17/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/17/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/17/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/25/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/30/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/30/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 10/30/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/30/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/30/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/30/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/31/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/31/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/31/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/31/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/31/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/31/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/31/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/31/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/31/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/31/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/06/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/06/2001