Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/20/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/06/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/14/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2002