Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/16/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/16/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/16/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/16/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/16/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/16/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/16/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/16/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/16/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/16/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/16/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/23/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/23/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/23/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/23/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/23/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/23/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/23/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/23/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/23/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/23/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/23/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/23/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/23/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/23/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/01/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/01/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 11/01/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/07/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/07/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/08/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/08/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/14/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/14/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 11/14/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/14/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/14/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/15/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/15/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/15/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/27/2001