Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/06/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/06/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/06/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/06/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/08/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/12/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/12/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/15/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/19/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/19/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/20/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/22/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/22/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/26/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/26/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/04/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/14/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/13/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/12/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/11/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/23/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/22/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/18/2002