Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/11/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/12/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/12/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/12/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/01/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/08/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/30/2001