There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Military Voting Rights bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Armed Services Absentee Ballot Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit a State from determining that a ballot submitted by an absent uniformed services voter was improperly or fraudulently cast unless the State finds clear and convincing evidence of fraud, to direct the Secretary of Defense to prepare and submit a plan for electronic voting by absent uniformed services voters, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/30/2001Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/31/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 01/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 01/31/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/31/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 01/31/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/31/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/31/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/31/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/31/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/31/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 01/31/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/31/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/31/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/31/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/31/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/06/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/06/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/06/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/08/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/13/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/14/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/01/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/01/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/25/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/30/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.311.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2001)

Armed Services Absentee Ballot Act of 2001 - Prohibits a State from refusing to count a ballot submitted in an election for Federal office by an absent uniformed services voter on the grounds that the ballot was improperly or fraudulently cast, unless the State finds clear and convincing evidence of fraud in the preparation or casting of the ballot by the voter.

Directs the Secretary of Defense to prepare and submit to Congress a plan for establishing a uniform electronic voting system for the use of absent uniformed services voters in elections for Federal office.