Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/25/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/25/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/25/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/25/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/25/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/25/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/25/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/29/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/29/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/29/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/29/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/29/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/29/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/29/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/29/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/29/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/29/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/29/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/29/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/29/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/29/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/29/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/29/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/29/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/29/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/29/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/29/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/29/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/29/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/29/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/29/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/29/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/29/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/29/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/29/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/29/2001
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/29/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/30/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/30/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/30/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/30/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/30/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/30/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/30/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/01/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/01/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/01/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2002