Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/12/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/12/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/12/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/12/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/25/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/30/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/01/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/01/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/16/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/16/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/16/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/27/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/27/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 02/05/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/06/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/06/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/07/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/12/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/12/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/12/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/14/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/27/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/18/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/19/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/19/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/09/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/10/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/16/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew