Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/01/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/15/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/15/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/11/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/13/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/07/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/19/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/19/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/19/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/19/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/22/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/12/2002