Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/16/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/16/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 10/16/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/01/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/01/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/01/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 11/01/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/16/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 12/04/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/29/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/05/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 02/26/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/07/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/07/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/07/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/07/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/13/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/13/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/13/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/13/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/13/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/10/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/25/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/09/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/20/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/21/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/04/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/18/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/08/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/11/2002