Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/16/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 10/16/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 10/16/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/16/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/25/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/05/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/05/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/12/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/12/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/19/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/19/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/19/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/19/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/19/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/19/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/19/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/19/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/27/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/27/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/16/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/23/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/23/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/23/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/26/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/26/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/26/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/11/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/11/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/11/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/11/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/11/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/24/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/24/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/10/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/10/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/10/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/10/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/10/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/16/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/13/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/13/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/13/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/13/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/14/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/14/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/22/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/22/2002