Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 10/17/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/17/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/17/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/17/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/17/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/17/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/08/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/08/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/08/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/27/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/27/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/29/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/29/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 11/29/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/12/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/12/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/20/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/05/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/18/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/24/2002