Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 10/23/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/23/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/23/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/23/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 10/23/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 10/23/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/23/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/25/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/25/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/25/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/25/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/25/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/25/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/25/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/30/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/30/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/30/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/30/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/30/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 11/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/01/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/13/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/13/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/13/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/20/2001