Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/24/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/31/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/31/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/01/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/01/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/04/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/06/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/10/2002