There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Gerald B. H. Solomon Freedom Consolidation Act of 2001

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom Consolidation Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To endorse the vision of further enlargement of the NATO Alliance articulated by President George W. Bush on June 15, 2001, and by former President William J. Clinton on October 22, 1996, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/10/2002Became Public Law No: 107-187. (TXT | PDF)
06/10/2002Signed by President.
05/29/2002Presented to President.
05/17/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 85 - 6. Record Vote Number: 116.
12/12/2001Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
11/07/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 372 - 46 (Roll no. 431).(text: CR H7865-7866)
11/05/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 107-266.
10/24/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
06/10/2002Became Public Law No: 107-187. (TXT | PDF)
06/10/2002Signed by President.
05/29/2002HousePresented to President.
05/20/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/17/2002SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 85 - 6. Record Vote Number: 116.
05/17/2002SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4514-4518)
05/16/2002SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4472-4486)
12/12/2001SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 282.
12/12/2001SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
12/12/2001SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/07/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/07/2001-1:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2001-1:13pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 372 - 46 (Roll no. 431). (text: CR H7865-7866)
11/07/2001-12:47pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
11/07/2001-12:39pmHouseRule H. Res. 277 passed House.
11/07/2001-11:42amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3167.
11/07/2001-11:41amHouseH.Amdt.385 On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2001-11:41amHouseH.Amdt.385 Amendment reported by the House Committee on Rules.
11/07/2001-11:40amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3167 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The amendment recommended by the Committee on International Relations now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. The amendment if offered by Mr. Lantos of California or his designee, shall be debatable for one hour.
11/07/2001-11:40amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 277. (consideration: CR H7861-7865)
11/06/2001-8:43pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 277 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3167 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The amendment recommended by the Committee on International Relations now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. The amendment if offered by Mr. Lantos of California or his designee, shall be debatable for one hour.
11/05/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 161.
11/05/2001HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 107-266.
11/01/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/01/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/24/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
10/24/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations10/24/2001 Referred to
11/01/2001 Markup by
11/05/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-266
Senate Foreign Relations11/07/2001 Referred to
12/12/2001 Markup by
12/12/2001 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3167. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (11/05/2001)

Gerald B. H. Solomon Freedom Consolidation Act of 2001 - Reaffirms support for continued enlargement of the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) Alliance.

Designates Slovakia for participation in the Partnership for Peace and eligible to receive certain security assistance under the NATO Participation Act of 1994.

Authorizes specified amounts of security assistance for FY 2002 for Estonia, Latvia, Lithuania, Slovakia, Slovenia, Bulgaria, and Romania.