There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Late Fee Emergency Relief Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit creditors from imposing late fees, increasing interest rates, or submitting adverse credit information with regard to the account of a consumer whose mail service has been disrupted due to a biological, chemical, or radiological attack, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/29/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/02/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/29/2001Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/01/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/06/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/06/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/08/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/13/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/13/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/15/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/15/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/27/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/04/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/05/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/11/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 12/11/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/19/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/23/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/27/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/29/2001 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit11/02/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3175.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3175. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/29/2001)

Late Fee Emergency Relief Act of 2001 - Amends the Truth in Lending Act to limit the late fee and annual percentage rate increase imposed upon a consumer credit obligation in the case of any consumer whose principal residence is located in a postal zip code designated by the Postmaster General as a biological, chemical, or radiological attack-related mail disruption area.

Requires the Postmaster General to: (1) designate such an area promptly for a 30-day period following any such mail disruption; and (2) disseminate monthly to specified agencies and publish in the Federal Register the postal zip codes designated as mail disruption areas.