Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/13/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/13/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/15/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/15/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/15/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/16/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/16/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/16/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/19/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/19/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/28/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 12/18/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/18/2001