Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/27/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/28/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/28/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/28/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/28/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/28/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/05/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/05/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 12/05/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/05/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/05/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/19/2001