Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 10/30/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/30/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/08/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/08/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/08/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/16/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/28/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/28/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/30/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/30/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/30/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/30/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/20/2001
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/06/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/04/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/04/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/04/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/10/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/10/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/23/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/19/2002