Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/14/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/14/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/14/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/14/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/14/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/14/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/14/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/14/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/14/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/16/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/16/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/16/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/19/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 12/04/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/24/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/24/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 01/24/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/24/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/24/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/24/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 01/29/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/05/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/05/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/05/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/08/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/08/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/08/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/08/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/14/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/14/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/14/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/14/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/07/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/14/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/16/2002