Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/06/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/06/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/08/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/08/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/12/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/12/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/01/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/01/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/01/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/01/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/01/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/01/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/01/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/01/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/05/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/06/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/13/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/14/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/19/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/06/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/11/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/25/2002