Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/07/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/08/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 11/08/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/14/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/27/2001