Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 11/01/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/13/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/13/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/17/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/19/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/09/2002