Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 11/01/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/13/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/13/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/13/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/13/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/13/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/15/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 11/15/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/15/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/15/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/15/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/15/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/16/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/16/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/16/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/16/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/16/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/16/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/16/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/16/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/16/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/16/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/16/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/16/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/16/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/16/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/16/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/28/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/28/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/28/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/28/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/28/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/28/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/29/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/29/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/29/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/29/2001
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/29/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/29/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/29/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 11/29/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/06/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/06/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/06/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/06/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 12/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/06/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 12/11/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 12/11/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 12/11/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 12/11/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 12/11/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/18/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/18/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew