Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 11/01/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/06/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/11/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 12/11/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 12/18/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/08/2002