Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/16/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/16/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/16/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/16/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/16/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/16/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/16/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/16/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 12/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/10/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/18/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/05/2002