Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 11/06/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 11/06/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 11/07/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/13/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/14/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 11/14/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/16/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/19/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/19/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/27/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/28/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/28/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 11/30/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/06/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/06/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/19/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/05/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/06/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/04/2002