Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/06/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/07/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 11/08/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 11/08/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/16/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/27/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/27/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/29/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/12/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/12/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/13/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/26/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/05/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/12/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/12/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/20/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/17/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/07/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/11/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/11/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/12/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/12/2002