Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/29/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/16/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/02/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew