There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 65 North Main Street in Cranbury, New Jersey, as the "Todd Beamer Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-129. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2002Signed by President.
01/04/2002Presented to President.
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2001Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14053)
12/05/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8864)
11/07/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-129. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2002Signed by President.
01/04/2002HousePresented to President.
12/21/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2001SenateSenate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14053)
12/17/2001SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
12/06/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
12/05/2001-1:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2001-1:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8864)
12/05/2001-12:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3248.
12/05/2001-12:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8864-8866)
12/05/2001-12:39pmHouseMrs. Davis, Jo Ann moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/07/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
11/07/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform11/07/2001 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs12/06/2001 Referred to
12/20/2001 Discharged from
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, Proliferation and Federal Services12/17/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/05/2001)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 65 North Main Street in Cranbury, New Jersey, as the Todd Beamer Post Office Building.