Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/15/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/27/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/07/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/16/2002