Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/08/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 11/08/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 11/08/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/08/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/08/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/19/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/19/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/19/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/19/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/19/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 11/19/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/19/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/19/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/19/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/19/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/19/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/19/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/19/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/19/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/19/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/19/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/19/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/19/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/19/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/04/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/04/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 12/18/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 12/18/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 12/18/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2002