Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/09/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/18/2001