Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/13/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/13/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/16/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/27/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/30/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 12/04/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/13/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/13/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/29/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/29/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/06/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/13/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/13/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/16/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/01/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/01/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/14/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/05/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/17/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/17/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/16/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/16/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/04/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2002