Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/18/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/05/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/19/2002