Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/31/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/06/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/06/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/14/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 03/14/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/04/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002