There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Vicksburg National Military Park Boundary Modification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Vicksburg National Military Park Boundary Modification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire the property known as Pemberton's Headquarters and to modify the boundary of Vicksburg National Military Park to include that property, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/17/2002Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-508.
11/15/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
06/17/2002Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/2002Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-508.
05/22/2002Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands Discharged.
05/22/2002Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/22/2002Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/11/2002Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands
11/19/2001Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
11/19/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
11/15/2001Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 11/15/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 11/15/2001

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources11/15/2001 Referred to
05/22/2002 Markup by
06/17/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-508
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands11/19/2001 Referred to
04/11/2002 Hearings by
05/22/2002 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3307. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (06/17/2002)

Vicksburg National Military Park Boundary Modification Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to acquire property known as Pemberton's Headquarters for inclusion in Vicksburg National Military Park.