Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/13/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/19/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/20/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/18/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/01/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/16/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/21/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/20/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/20/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/25/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/12/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/12/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/15/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/01/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/10/2002