Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 12/18/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/12/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/12/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/27/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/05/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/05/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/05/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/05/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/06/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/07/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/07/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/14/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/20/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/11/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/16/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/16/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/02/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/15/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/20/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/17/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew