Refine your search

17 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
12/27/2001 Became Public Law No: 107-105.
Type of Action: To President
12/27/2001 Signed by President.
Type of Action: To President
12/18/2001 House Presented to President.
12/12/2001 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/12/2001 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13077-13078)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/05/2001 Senate Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.
Type of Action: Calendars
12/04/2001-7:34pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/04/2001-7:34pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 466). (text: CR H8772-8774)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/04/2001-4:53pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/04/2001-4:21pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3323.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/04/2001-4:21pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8772-8778, H8813-8814)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/04/2001-4:21pm House Mr. Tauzin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/03/2001 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
11/16/2001 House Referred to House Ways and Means
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
11/16/2001 House Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
11/16/2001 House Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
11/16/2001 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral