Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/24/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 02/13/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/13/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/13/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/07/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/12/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/14/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/21/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/26/2002