Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/05/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/05/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 12/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/05/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/05/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 12/17/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 12/17/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/17/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 12/17/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/17/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 12/17/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/17/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 12/17/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/17/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/17/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/17/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/17/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 12/17/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/17/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/23/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/23/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/13/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/13/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/13/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/13/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/13/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/12/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/12/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/14/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/14/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/14/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/14/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/14/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/14/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/14/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/14/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/12/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/12/2002