There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reservists Pay Security Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that a Federal employee who takes leave without pay in order to perform service as a member of the uniformed services or member of the National Guard shall continue to receive pay in an amount which, when taken together with the pay and allowances such individual is receiving for such service, will be no less than the basic pay such individual would then be receiving if no interruption in employment had occurred.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/16/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/28/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on the Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
11/16/2001Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/12/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/12/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/23/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/23/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/24/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/29/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/29/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/05/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/07/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/26/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/26/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/15/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/15/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/15/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/22/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/22/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/04/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/04/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/10/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/10/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/10/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/13/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/13/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/08/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/08/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/21/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/21/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/28/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform11/16/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization11/28/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3337. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/2001)

Reservist Pay Security Act of 2001 - Entitles a person who is absent from his or her position of Federal employment to perform service in the uniformed services or the National Guard to receive from his or her agency an amount that, when added to the pay and allowances for such service, equals the basic pay which would have been payable to such employee for such period of service for which such employee is not otherwise compensated.