Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/16/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/04/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/12/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/12/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/23/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/23/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/23/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/24/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/29/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/29/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/29/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/05/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/07/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/13/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/26/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/26/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/26/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/15/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/15/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/15/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/22/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/22/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/04/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/04/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/04/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/10/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/10/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/10/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/13/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/13/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/08/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/08/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/11/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/21/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/21/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/28/2002