Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/27/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/27/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/27/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/27/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/27/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/28/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/28/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/28/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/28/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/28/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/28/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/28/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/28/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/28/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 12/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/04/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 12/05/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 12/11/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/11/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/11/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/11/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 12/11/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/12/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/12/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 12/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/13/2002